|
07/09/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 64, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2453.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1607.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 5).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1040.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|