California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB781 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2019

Enrolled

Bill June 28, 2019

Chaptered

Bill July 9, 2019

Amended

Bill June 10, 2019
Bill March 28, 2019