California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB803 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2019

Amended

Bill September 4, 2019
Bill July 5, 2019
Bill June 20, 2019