|
09/27/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 355, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3169.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2280.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2019
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1770.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2019
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|