California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB840 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2019

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2019

Amended

Bill August 20, 2019
Bill June 27, 2019
Bill June 11, 2019
Bill May 1, 2019
Bill April 12, 2019
Bill March 25, 2019