|
09/20/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 310, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3008.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2291.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2019
|
Measure version as amended on July 1 corrected.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1770.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2019
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|