|
08/30/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 184, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2660.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2050.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1362.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2019
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|