Assembly | 09/14/2020 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 39, Statutes of 2020. | ||
Assembly | 09/14/2020 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/28/2020 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/28/2020 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4386.) | ||
Senate | 08/25/2020 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/14/2020 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/13/2020 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/04/2020 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (August 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2020 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Senate | 09/14/2019 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 09/14/2019 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3618.) | ||
Assembly | 09/11/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (September 11). | ||
Assembly | 08/15/2019 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 08/13/2019 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 08/12/2019 | Introduced. To print. |