Assembly
|
09/14/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 41, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2020
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2020
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5334.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2020
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2020
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4386.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2020
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2020
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2020
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (August 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/30/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2019
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2019
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3618.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (September 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2019
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2019
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2019
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|