California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR127 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill August 15, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2020

Chaptered

Bill September 14, 2020

Amended

Bill August 7, 2020
Bill July 30, 2020