Senate | 03/09/2020 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2020 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 4256.) | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2020 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2020 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (February 27). | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2020 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2020 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/06/2020 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/30/2020 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 01/29/2020 | Introduced. To print. |