1 | | - | Amended IN Assembly February 14, 2020 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 157Introduced by Assembly Member Waldron(Coauthor: Assembly Member Voepel)January 29, 2020Relative to California Arbor Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 157, as amended, Waldron. California Arbor Day.This measure would proclaim April 24, recognize March 7, 2020, as California Arbor Day, and would urge California residents to observe the day with appropriate tree-planting activities and programs.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, In 1872, J. Sterling Morton successfully proposed to the Nebraska State Board of Agriculture the first tree-planting holiday, which was to be called Arbor Day; andWHEREAS, This holiday, which has spread throughout the United States and is observed in many countries around the world, was first commemorated with the planting of more than 1,000,000 trees in the State of Nebraska; andWHEREAS, The purpose of Arbor Day is to encourage people to plant trees, and many communities organize tree-planting and litter-collecting events on or around the holiday; andWHEREAS, The Legislature proclaimed the first California Arbor Day on March 7, 1974; andWHEREAS, In California, trees are a valuable economic asset that helps to maintain and increase property values and to attract businesses and new residents to urban areas; andWHEREAS, Trees promote energy conservation by providing shade and increasing humidity, which moderates temperature extremes, and reducing the energy necessary to heat and cool buildings and homes; andWHEREAS, Trees planted in urban areas reduce the emissions of greenhouse gases, consistent with the states statutory targets, by reducing energy consumption, and sequester carbon; andWHEREAS, Trees improve Californias air quality by reducing air pollution, removing airborne particulate matter from the atmosphere, and purifying the air; andWHEREAS, Trees protect and purify Californias limited water resources by reducing surface runoff, contributing to stormwater management activity, and protecting urban water resources; andWHEREAS, Trees provide essential habitat for much of Californias wildlife, including many listed, threatened, and endangered species; andWHEREAS, Trees enhance the aesthetic quality of life in urban communities by functioning as a natural buffer for surface noise and provide a natural recreational resource for Californias youth; andWHEREAS, California has more urban and community forestry organizations than any other state because trees, green spaces, and canopy cover are important to our children, our residents, and visitors to our state; andWHEREAS, Maximizing the benefits of trees through multiple-objective projects that contribute to public infrastructure services can provide cost-effective solutions to the needs of underserved and severely underserved communities, and of urban and suburban areas, by harnessing the aforementioned benefits provided by trees; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims the day of April 24, recognizes March 7, 2020, as California Arbor Day, and urges California residents to observe the day with appropriate tree-planting activities and programs; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 157Introduced by Assembly Member Waldron(Coauthor: Assembly Member Voepel)January 29, 2020 Relative to California Arbor Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 157, as introduced, Waldron. California Arbor Day.This measure would proclaim April 24, 2020, as California Arbor Day, and would urge California residents to observe the day with appropriate tree-planting activities and programs.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, In 1872, J. Sterling Morton successfully proposed to the Nebraska State Board of Agriculture the first tree-planting holiday, which was to be called Arbor Day; andWHEREAS, This holiday, which has spread throughout the United States and is observed in many countries around the world, was first commemorated with the planting of more than 1,000,000 trees in the State of Nebraska; andWHEREAS, The purpose of Arbor Day is to encourage people to plant trees, and many communities organize tree-planting and litter-collecting events on or around the holiday; andWHEREAS, In California, trees are a valuable economic asset that helps to maintain and increase property values and to attract businesses and new residents to urban areas; andWHEREAS, Trees promote energy conservation by providing shade and increasing humidity, which moderates temperature extremes, and reducing the energy necessary to heat and cool buildings and homes; andWHEREAS, Trees planted in urban areas reduce the emissions of greenhouse gases, consistent with the states statutory targets, by reducing energy consumption, and sequester carbon; andWHEREAS, Trees improve Californias air quality by reducing air pollution, removing airborne particulate matter from the atmosphere, and purifying the air; andWHEREAS, Trees protect and purify Californias limited water resources by reducing surface runoff, contributing to stormwater management activity, and protecting urban water resources; andWHEREAS, Trees provide essential habitat for much of Californias wildlife, including many listed, threatened, and endangered species; andWHEREAS, Trees enhance the aesthetic quality of life in urban communities by functioning as a natural buffer for surface noise and provide a natural recreational resource for Californias youth; andWHEREAS, California has more urban and community forestry organizations than any other state because trees, green spaces, and canopy cover are important to our children, our residents, and visitors to our state; andWHEREAS, Maximizing the benefits of trees through multiple-objective projects that contribute to public infrastructure services can provide cost-effective solutions to the needs of underserved and severely underserved communities, and of urban and suburban areas, by harnessing the aforementioned benefits provided by trees; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims the day of April 24, 2020, as California Arbor Day, and urges California residents to observe the day with appropriate tree-planting activities and programs; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|