Assembly
|
07/23/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 120, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/23/2019
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2625.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2019
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 2620.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2019
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2045.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2019
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2019
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2019
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2019
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 682.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2019
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/04/2019
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2019
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/28/2019
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|