California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR17 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 28, 2019

Enrolled

Bill July 12, 2019

Chaptered

Bill July 23, 2019

Amended

Bill July 2, 2019
Bill April 29, 2019