Assembly
|
07/08/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 108, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2019
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2019
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2019
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1875.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2019
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2019
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2019
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2019
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2019
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1363.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2019
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2019
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/07/2019
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/06/2019
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|