1 | | - | Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 47 CHAPTER 108Relative to the CAL FIRE Firefighter Braden Varney Memorial Highway. [ Filed with Secretary of State July 08, 2019. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 47, Bigelow. CAL-FIRE Firefighter Braden Varney Memorial Highway.This measure would designate a specified portion of State Route 140 in the County of Mariposa as the CAL-FIRE Firefighter Braden Varney Memorial Highway. The measure would request that the Department of Transportation determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, erect those signs.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: YES Bill TextWHEREAS, Department of Forestry and Fire Protection Heavy Fire Equipment Operator Braden Varney passed away in the line of duty on July 14, 2018, at 36 years of age, while battling the Ferguson Fire in Mariposa County, California; andWHEREAS, Braden Varney is survived by his mother, Lynn; loving wife, Jessica; daughter, Maleah; son, Nolan; and sister, Chale; andWHEREAS, Braden Varney was born in Mariposa County on May 12, 1982, and was raised there; andWHEREAS, During his high school years in Mariposa County, Bradens favorite sport was baseball, from which he was known for hitting home runs; andWHEREAS, Braden loved helping others, building quality relationships, creating memorable moments, sharing his knowledge, and making everyone feel special; andWHEREAS, Braden was incredibly close to everyone in his life and was a friend to all; andWHEREAS, In his private life, Braden loved houseboating, riding motorcycles, camping, shooting, fishing, and operating equipment; andWHEREAS, Braden Varney was a 10-year veteran of the Department of Forestry and Fire Protection, having followed in the footsteps of his late father, Gordie Varney, another department heavy fire equipment operator who also perished in the line of duty; andWHEREAS, Throughout Bradens life, he generously donated thousands of dollars worth of time and equipment to build and maintain the road to the Barrier-Sweetwater Youth Camp in Mariposa County; andWHEREAS, Braden and his father simply loved Sam Hensleys vision and wanted to support getting the kids to camp; andWHEREAS, On July 14, 2018, Braden was operating his bulldozer on the Ferguson Fire in Mariposa County and, during the early morning hours, his bulldozer experienced a rollover that resulted in Bradens passing; andWHEREAS, We pause to honor Braden Varney for his dedication to public service and for his ultimate sacrifice in the line of duty; andWHEREAS, Braden Varney exemplified the professionalism, work ethic, dedication, and self-sacrifice for which Department of Forestry and Fire Protection firefighters are known, and he will never be forgotten; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes the contributions of Department of Forestry and Fire Protection Firefighter Braden Varney to the people of California and designates the portion of State Route 140 between its junction with State Route 49 (postmile 22.080) and Triangle Road (postmile 26.290) in the County of Mariposa as the CAL FIRE Firefighter Braden Varney Memorial Highway; and be it furtherResolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs, consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system, showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover the cost, to erect those signs; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Department of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled July 03, 2019 Passed IN Senate July 01, 2019 Passed IN Assembly April 25, 2019 Amended IN Assembly April 12, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 47Introduced by Assembly Member BigelowMarch 06, 2019Relative to the CAL FIRE Firefighter Braden Varney Memorial Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 47, Bigelow. CAL-FIRE Firefighter Braden Varney Memorial Highway.This measure would designate a specified portion of State Route 140 in the County of Mariposa as the CAL-FIRE Firefighter Braden Varney Memorial Highway. The measure would request that the Department of Transportation determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, erect those signs.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: YES Bill TextWHEREAS, Department of Forestry and Fire Protection Heavy Fire Equipment Operator Braden Varney passed away in the line of duty on July 14, 2018, at 36 years of age, while battling the Ferguson Fire in Mariposa County, California; andWHEREAS, Braden Varney is survived by his mother, Lynn; loving wife, Jessica; daughter, Maleah; son, Nolan; and sister, Chale; andWHEREAS, Braden Varney was born in Mariposa County on May 12, 1982, and was raised there; andWHEREAS, During his high school years in Mariposa County, Bradens favorite sport was baseball, from which he was known for hitting home runs; andWHEREAS, Braden loved helping others, building quality relationships, creating memorable moments, sharing his knowledge, and making everyone feel special; andWHEREAS, Braden was incredibly close to everyone in his life and was a friend to all; andWHEREAS, In his private life, Braden loved houseboating, riding motorcycles, camping, shooting, fishing, and operating equipment; andWHEREAS, Braden Varney was a 10-year veteran of the Department of Forestry and Fire Protection, having followed in the footsteps of his late father, Gordie Varney, another department heavy fire equipment operator who also perished in the line of duty; andWHEREAS, Throughout Bradens life, he generously donated thousands of dollars worth of time and equipment to build and maintain the road to the Barrier-Sweetwater Youth Camp in Mariposa County; andWHEREAS, Braden and his father simply loved Sam Hensleys vision and wanted to support getting the kids to camp; andWHEREAS, On July 14, 2018, Braden was operating his bulldozer on the Ferguson Fire in Mariposa County and, during the early morning hours, his bulldozer experienced a rollover that resulted in Bradens passing; andWHEREAS, We pause to honor Braden Varney for his dedication to public service and for his ultimate sacrifice in the line of duty; andWHEREAS, Braden Varney exemplified the professionalism, work ethic, dedication, and self-sacrifice for which Department of Forestry and Fire Protection firefighters are known, and he will never be forgotten; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes the contributions of Department of Forestry and Fire Protection Firefighter Braden Varney to the people of California and designates the portion of State Route 140 between its junction with State Route 49 (postmile 22.080) and Triangle Road (postmile 26.290) in the County of Mariposa as the CAL FIRE Firefighter Braden Varney Memorial Highway; and be it furtherResolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs, consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system, showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover the cost, to erect those signs; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Department of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|