Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 148, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2019
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2019
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 3. Page 2576.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2019
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2019
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2019
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2019
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Page 2220.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2019
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2019
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2019
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2019
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2019
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|