Assembly
|
07/10/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 113, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/10/2019
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 2546.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2019
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1880.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2019
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2019
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1405.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2019
|
Amended. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2019
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2019
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2019
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|