California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR66 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 4, 2019

Enrolled

Bill July 8, 2019

Chaptered

Bill July 10, 2019

Amended

Bill May 20, 2019
Bill April 24, 2019