Assembly | 07/18/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 116, Statutes of 2019. | ||
Assembly | 07/18/2019 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 12:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 07/08/2019 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2567.). | ||
Assembly | 07/01/2019 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | ||
Senate | 07/01/2019 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1874.) | ||
Senate | 06/26/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/25/2019 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 06/19/2019 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/10/2019 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2019 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 2219.) | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2019 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 24). | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2019 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2019 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2019 | Introduced. To print. |