1 | | - | Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 95 CHAPTER 116Relative to Secure Your Load Day. [ Filed with Secretary of State July 18, 2019. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 95, Choi. Secure Your Load Day.This measure would declare June 6, 2019, as Secure Your Load Day in California.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, The State of California is the nations most populous state with 38.8 million residents and growing; andWHEREAS, Traffic in California has become more congested in recent years, resulting in an increase in road debris and automobile collisions; and WHEREAS, Over 200,000 accidents and 500 traffic deaths occurred in the United States between 2011 and 2014 due to dangerous road debris from unsecured loads; and WHEREAS, Ethan Hawks, a 17-year-old senior and football star from Whittier Christian High School, was a victim of a tragic accident in the County of Orange caused by a heavy piece of metal escaping from another vehicle and striking the car that he was riding in, ultimately taking his life; andWHEREAS, All residents of California should recognize the dangers of driving, and be accountable for their habits while in a vehicle; andWHEREAS, Section 23114 of the Vehicle Code prohibits a vehicle from being driven on a highway unless it is constructed, covered, or loaded so as to prevent any of its contents or load from escaping from the vehicle; andWHEREAS, The commonsense, routine act of securing every load protects the lives of California residents, and this precaution must not be overlooked; and WHEREAS, The State of California recognizes and honors the profound suffering of those harmed by unsecured loads; and WHEREAS, The State of California stands in solidarity with persons impacted by those instances of avoidable incidents caused by unsecured loads; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature declares June 6, 2019, as Secure Your Load Day in California to increase public awareness of the necessity of securing loads on vehicles using the states highways; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Motor Vehicles and to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled July 09, 2019 Passed IN Senate July 01, 2019 Passed IN Assembly July 08, 2019 Amended IN Senate June 25, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 95Introduced by Assembly Member Choi(Coauthors: Assembly Members Mathis, Voepel, Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Bauer-Kahan, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Bonta, Brough, Calderon, Carrillo, Cervantes, Chau, Chen, Chiu, Chu, Cooley, Cooper, Cunningham, Dahle, Daly, Flora, Fong, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Gloria, Gray, Grayson, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kamlager-Dove, Kiley, Lackey, Levine, Limn, Low, Maienschein, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Obernolte, ODonnell, Patterson, Petrie-Norris, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Salas, Smith, Ting, Waldron, Weber, Wicks, and Wood)(Coauthors: Senators Bates and Dodd)May 15, 2019Relative to Secure Your Load Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 95, Choi. Secure Your Load Day.This measure would declare June 6, 2019, as Secure Your Load Day in California.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, The State of California is the nations most populous state with 38.8 million residents and growing; andWHEREAS, Traffic in California has become more congested in recent years, resulting in an increase in road debris and automobile collisions; and WHEREAS, Over 200,000 accidents and 500 traffic deaths occurred in the United States between 2011 and 2014 due to dangerous road debris from unsecured loads; and WHEREAS, Ethan Hawks, a 17-year-old senior and football star from Whittier Christian High School, was a victim of a tragic accident in the County of Orange caused by a heavy piece of metal escaping from another vehicle and striking the car that he was riding in, ultimately taking his life; andWHEREAS, All residents of California should recognize the dangers of driving, and be accountable for their habits while in a vehicle; andWHEREAS, Section 23114 of the Vehicle Code prohibits a vehicle from being driven on a highway unless it is constructed, covered, or loaded so as to prevent any of its contents or load from escaping from the vehicle; andWHEREAS, The commonsense, routine act of securing every load protects the lives of California residents, and this precaution must not be overlooked; and WHEREAS, The State of California recognizes and honors the profound suffering of those harmed by unsecured loads; and WHEREAS, The State of California stands in solidarity with persons impacted by those instances of avoidable incidents caused by unsecured loads; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature declares June 6, 2019, as Secure Your Load Day in California to increase public awareness of the necessity of securing loads on vehicles using the states highways; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Motor Vehicles and to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|