California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR99 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill June 4, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2019

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2019

Amended

Bill August 28, 2019
Bill June 24, 2019