1 | | - | Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 99 CHAPTER 166Relative to civil rights. [ Filed with Secretary of State September 26, 2019. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 99, Low. Civil rights: lesbian, gay, bisexual, transgender, or queer people.This measure would call upon all Californians to embrace the individual and social benefits of family and community acceptance, upon religious leaders to counsel on LGBTQ matters from a place of love, compassion, and knowledge of the psychological and other harms of conversion therapy, and upon the people of California and the institutions of California with great moral influence to model equitable treatment of all people of the state.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, The California State Legislature has found that being lesbian, gay, bisexual, transgender, or queer (LGBTQ) is not a disease, disorder, illness, deficiency, or shortcoming; andWHEREAS, Major professional associations of mental and physical health recognize that being LGBTQ is part of natural variations that occur in sexual orientation and gender identity, and recommend responsive services that foster self-acceptance and skills to cope with social stigma and discrimination; andWHEREAS, Practices or therapies that attempt to create a change in a persons sexual orientation or gender identity are often referred to as conversion therapy; andWHEREAS, Some family, caregivers, and communities promote conversion therapy when a person is known or thought to be LGBTQ; andWHEREAS, California law recognizes that performing conversion therapy on young persons is ineffective, unethical, and harmful; andWHEREAS, Conversion therapy has been rejected as ineffective, unethical, and harmful by leading medical, mental health, and child welfare organizations in the United States; andWHEREAS, The stigma associated with being LGBTQ often created by groups in society, including therapists and religious groups, has caused disproportionately high rates of suicide, attempted suicide, depression, rejection, and isolation amongst LGBTQ and questioning individuals; andWHEREAS, The State of California has a compelling interest in protecting the physical and psychological well-being of minors, including LGBTQ youth, and in protecting its minors against exposure to serious harms caused by family rejection and attempts to change sexual orientation or gender identity; andWHEREAS, In a pluralistic society, people differing along spectrums of political and religious perspectives share a common responsibility of protecting the health and well-being of all children and vulnerable communities; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature calls upon all Californians to embrace the individual and social benefits of family and community acceptance; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature calls upon religious leaders to counsel on LGBTQ matters from a place of love, compassion, and knowledge of the psychological and other harms of conversion therapy; and be it furtherResolved, That in addressing the stigma often associated with persons who identify as LGBTQ, we call on the people of Californiaespecially its counselors, pastors, religious workers, educators, and legislatorsand the institutions of California with great moral influenceespecially its churches, universities, colleges, and other schools, counseling centers, activist groups, and religious centersto model equitable treatment of all people of the state; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled September 12, 2019 Passed IN Senate September 04, 2019 Passed IN Assembly September 09, 2019 Amended IN Senate August 28, 2019 Amended IN Assembly June 24, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 99Introduced by Assembly Member Low(Principal coauthors: Assembly Members Cervantes, Eggman, and Gloria)(Principal coauthors: Senators Atkins, Beall, Galgiani, Lena Gonzalez, McGuire, Pan, Portantino, Stern, Umberg, Wieckowski, and Wiener)(Coauthors: Assembly Members Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Bauer-Kahan, Bloom, Boerner Horvath, Bonta, Burke, Calderon, Carrillo, Chiu, Chu, Friedman, Gabriel, Cristina Garcia, Gipson, Gonzalez, Kalra, Kamlager-Dove, Levine, Maienschein, McCarty, Medina, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, ODonnell, Petrie-Norris, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Smith, Mark Stone, Ting, Wicks, Wood, Berman, Chau, Cooley, Cooper, Daly, Frazier, Eduardo Garcia, Gray, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Limn, Mayes, Mullin, Rendon, Salas, Santiago, and Weber)June 04, 2019Relative to civil rights. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 99, Low. Civil rights: lesbian, gay, bisexual, transgender, or queer people.This measure would call upon all Californians to embrace the individual and social benefits of family and community acceptance, upon religious leaders to counsel on LGBTQ matters from a place of love, compassion, and knowledge of the psychological and other harms of conversion therapy, and upon the people of California and the institutions of California with great moral influence to model equitable treatment of all people of the state.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, The California State Legislature has found that being lesbian, gay, bisexual, transgender, or queer (LGBTQ) is not a disease, disorder, illness, deficiency, or shortcoming; andWHEREAS, Major professional associations of mental and physical health recognize that being LGBTQ is part of natural variations that occur in sexual orientation and gender identity, and recommend responsive services that foster self-acceptance and skills to cope with social stigma and discrimination; andWHEREAS, Practices or therapies that attempt to create a change in a persons sexual orientation or gender identity are often referred to as conversion therapy; andWHEREAS, Some family, caregivers, and communities promote conversion therapy when a person is known or thought to be LGBTQ; andWHEREAS, California law recognizes that performing conversion therapy on young persons is ineffective, unethical, and harmful; andWHEREAS, Conversion therapy has been rejected as ineffective, unethical, and harmful by leading medical, mental health, and child welfare organizations in the United States; andWHEREAS, The stigma associated with being LGBTQ often created by groups in society, including therapists and religious groups, has caused disproportionately high rates of suicide, attempted suicide, depression, rejection, and isolation amongst LGBTQ and questioning individuals; andWHEREAS, The State of California has a compelling interest in protecting the physical and psychological well-being of minors, including LGBTQ youth, and in protecting its minors against exposure to serious harms caused by family rejection and attempts to change sexual orientation or gender identity; andWHEREAS, In a pluralistic society, people differing along spectrums of political and religious perspectives share a common responsibility of protecting the health and well-being of all children and vulnerable communities; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature calls upon all Californians to embrace the individual and social benefits of family and community acceptance; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature calls upon religious leaders to counsel on LGBTQ matters from a place of love, compassion, and knowledge of the psychological and other harms of conversion therapy; and be it furtherResolved, That in addressing the stigma often associated with persons who identify as LGBTQ, we call on the people of Californiaespecially its counselors, pastors, religious workers, educators, and legislatorsand the institutions of California with great moral influenceespecially its churches, universities, colleges, and other schools, counseling centers, activist groups, and religious centersto model equitable treatment of all people of the state; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|