Assembly
|
09/26/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 182, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/26/2019
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 5. Page 3135.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2019
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 3. Page 2508.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2019
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2019
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2019
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 1. Page 2568.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2019
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2019
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2019
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2019
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2019
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|