Senate | 07/10/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 07/01/2019 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/27/2019 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 0. Page 2454.) | ||
Assembly | 06/27/2019 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (June 18). | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2019 | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2019 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2019 | Introduced. To print. |