Assembly | 06/25/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 98, Statutes of 2019. | ||
Assembly | 06/25/2019 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2019 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2366.). | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2019 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | ||
Senate | 06/17/2019 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1607.) | ||
Senate | 06/11/2019 | Amended. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/10/2019 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 5). | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 03/26/2019 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2019 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 815.) | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 19). | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2019 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | ||
Assembly | 03/07/2019 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 01/28/2019 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | ||
Assembly | 01/08/2019 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 01/07/2019 | Introduced. To print. |