California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AJR2 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2019

Enrolled

Bill June 21, 2019

Chaptered

Bill June 25, 2019

Amended

Bill June 11, 2019
Bill March 7, 2019