LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2019-2020 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AR66
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AR66
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2019-2020 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AR66
Action History
Assembly
03/05/2020
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4257.).
Assembly
02/27/2020
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (February 27).
Assembly
01/13/2020
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Assembly
01/09/2020
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
Assembly
01/09/2020
Referred to Com. on RLS.
Assembly
09/13/2019
Introduced.