California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AR66 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 01/09/2020

                            Amended IN  Assembly  January 09, 2020 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION House Resolution No. 66Introduced by Assembly Members Choi and Quirk-SilvaSeptember 13, 2019Relative to Yu Gwan-sun Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTHR 66, as amended, Choi. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, The March 1st Movement was inspired by the Fourteen Points outlined by President Woodrow Wilson at the Paris Peace Conference and was the first step taken by Koreans for independence; andWHEREAS, The reading of the Korean Declaration of Independence, which was drafted by historian Choe Nam-seon, in Taehwagwan Restaurant in Seoul and the subsequent signing of the document signaled the beginning of the independence movement for Korea; and WHEREAS, From March 1 to April 11, 1919, approximately 2,000,000 Koreans participated in more than 1,500 demonstrations, which are referred to today as the Korean independence movement; and WHEREAS, Yu Gwan-sun is best known as an organizer in the March 1st Movement in the peaceful demonstration against the Imperial Japanese colonial rule of Korea; andWHEREAS, The protests and the March 1st Movement sparked the creation of the Provisional Government of the Republic of Korea, and while the campaign failed to achieve its goal of independence, March 1 is celebrated by both North and South Korea today as a national holiday; and WHEREAS, The Assembly of the State of California recognized March 1, 2019, as Yu Gwan-sun Day in the State of California in honor of the centennial commemorative year of the March 1st Movement of Korean independence. The centennial commemoration of the March 1st Movement of Korean independence, which brought Californians together for this momentous event, and was marked with movie presentations, celebrations, and historical seminars to educate the community on the historical importance of the movement; andWHEREAS, California is home to the largest population of Korean Americans in the entire country; andWHEREAS, The contributions of the Korean American community in California have strengthened this great state and continue to promote the incredible diversity of California; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, That the Assembly recognizes March 1, 2019, as Yu Gwan-sun Day in the State of California in honor of the centennial commemorative year of the March 1st Movement of Korean independence; and be it furtherResolved,RESOLVED BY THE ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, That the Assembly recognizes March 1, 2020, and each March 1 thereafter, as Yu Gwan-sun Day in the State of California in honor of the anniversary of the March 1st Movement of Korean independence; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Amended IN  Assembly  January 09, 2020 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION House Resolution No. 66Introduced by Assembly Members Choi and Quirk-SilvaSeptember 13, 2019Relative to Yu Gwan-sun Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTHR 66, as amended, Choi. Digest Key

 Amended IN  Assembly  January 09, 2020

Amended IN  Assembly  January 09, 2020

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION

 House Resolution 

No. 66

Introduced by Assembly Members Choi and Quirk-SilvaSeptember 13, 2019

Introduced by Assembly Members Choi and Quirk-Silva
September 13, 2019

Relative to Yu Gwan-sun Day. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

HR 66, as amended, Choi. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, The March 1st Movement was inspired by the Fourteen Points outlined by President Woodrow Wilson at the Paris Peace Conference and was the first step taken by Koreans for independence; and

WHEREAS, The reading of the Korean Declaration of Independence, which was drafted by historian Choe Nam-seon, in Taehwagwan Restaurant in Seoul and the subsequent signing of the document signaled the beginning of the independence movement for Korea; and 

WHEREAS, From March 1 to April 11, 1919, approximately 2,000,000 Koreans participated in more than 1,500 demonstrations, which are referred to today as the Korean independence movement; and 

WHEREAS, Yu Gwan-sun is best known as an organizer in the March 1st Movement in the peaceful demonstration against the Imperial Japanese colonial rule of Korea; and

WHEREAS, The protests and the March 1st Movement sparked the creation of the Provisional Government of the Republic of Korea, and while the campaign failed to achieve its goal of independence, March 1 is celebrated by both North and South Korea today as a national holiday; and 

WHEREAS, The Assembly of the State of California recognized March 1, 2019, as Yu Gwan-sun Day in the State of California in honor of the centennial commemorative year of the March 1st Movement of Korean independence. The centennial commemoration of the March 1st Movement of Korean independence, which brought Californians together for this momentous event, and was marked with movie presentations, celebrations, and historical seminars to educate the community on the historical importance of the movement; and

WHEREAS, California is home to the largest population of Korean Americans in the entire country; and

WHEREAS, The contributions of the Korean American community in California have strengthened this great state and continue to promote the incredible diversity of California; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, That the Assembly recognizes March 1, 2019, as Yu Gwan-sun Day in the State of California in honor of the centennial commemorative year of the March 1st Movement of Korean independence; and be it further



Resolved,



RESOLVED BY THE ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, That the Assembly recognizes March 1, 2020, and each March 1 thereafter, as Yu Gwan-sun Day in the State of California in honor of the anniversary of the March 1st Movement of Korean independence; and be it further

Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.