LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2019-2020 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AR89
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AR89
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2019-2020 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AR89
Action History
Assembly
08/30/2020
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5277.).
Assembly
08/03/2020
Ordered to Consent Calendar.
Assembly
03/12/2020
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 12).
Assembly
03/09/2020
Referred to Com. on RLS.
Assembly
03/04/2020
Introduced.