|
09/25/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 164, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2020
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2020
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5277.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2020
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/29/2020
|
July 29 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/27/2020
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2020
|
Referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2020
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3687.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2020
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 3540.) (May 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2020
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2020
|
March 31 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2020
|
Set for hearing March 31.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2020
|
Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2020
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2020
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|