California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1117 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2020

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2020

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2020

Amended

Bill July 13, 2020
Bill May 20, 2020