|
09/29/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 248, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2020
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2020
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2020
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5282.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2020
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2020
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/27/2020
|
July 30 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2020
|
July 22 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2020
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2020
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 3841.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3769.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2020
|
Set for hearing June 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2020
|
June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2020
|
Set for hearing June 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2020
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3583.) (May 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2020
|
Set for hearing May 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2020
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2020
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2020
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2020
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2020
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|