California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1141 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2020

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2020

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2020

Amended

Bill August 6, 2020
Bill July 27, 2020
Bill May 29, 2020
Bill May 6, 2020