Senate | 06/18/2020 | June 18 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2020 | Set for hearing June 18. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2020 | June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2020 | Set for hearing June 9. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2020 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3560.) (May 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2020 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2020 | Set for hearing May 19. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2020 | March 23 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2020 | Set for hearing March 23. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2020 | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2020 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2020 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |