|
09/25/2020
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2020
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2020
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 1.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2020
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 5308.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2020
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2020
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2020
|
August 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2020
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2020
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2020
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3794.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2020
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2020
|
Set for hearing June 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2020
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3534.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2020
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2020
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2020
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|