California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1207 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2020

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2020

Amended

Bill August 25, 2020
Bill August 6, 2020
Bill May 19, 2020