Assembly
|
08/25/2020
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2020
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2020
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2020
|
August 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/30/2020
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/28/2020
|
July 28 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2020
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2020
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3818.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2020
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2020
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3771.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2020
|
Set for hearing June 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2020
|
June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2020
|
Set for hearing June 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3595.) (May 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2020
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2020
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2020
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2020
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2020
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2020
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|