California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1299 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2020

Amended

Bill August 25, 2020
Bill August 24, 2020
Bill August 3, 2020
Bill June 18, 2020
Bill April 1, 2020