|
09/05/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 243, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
09/05/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2242.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2019
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2019
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2666.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2019
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 593.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 424.) (March 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2019
|
Set for hearing March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2019
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|