California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB143 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2019

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2019

Chaptered

Bill September 5, 2019

Amended

Bill June 18, 2019
Bill April 3, 2019
Bill March 20, 2019