|
10/04/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 525, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/17/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2784.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3178.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2019
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2019
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2019
|
June 26 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2019
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1271.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1090.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2019
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 649.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2019
|
March 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2019
|
Set for hearing March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2019
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|