California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB150 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 22, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 4, 2019

Amended

Bill September 5, 2019
Bill September 3, 2019
Bill June 13, 2019
Bill April 1, 2019