|
10/02/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 402, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/18/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2867.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2019
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3331.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2019
|
August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2019
|
(Received at desk July 10 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10)).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1272.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1091.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2019
|
April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 619.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2019
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2019
|
March 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2019
|
Set for hearing March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|