California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB160 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 2, 2019

Amended

Bill September 3, 2019
Bill July 3, 2019
Bill April 2, 2019