|
10/09/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 698, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/18/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2848.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 9. Page 3348.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2019
|
August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/10/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 1333.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
From consent calendar on motion of Senator Jackson.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 905.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2019
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|