California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB176 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 28, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2019

Amended

Bill September 3, 2019
Bill July 10, 2019
Bill May 22, 2019
Bill April 25, 2019
Bill March 27, 2019