|
10/12/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 841, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/12/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/18/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2841.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3254.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2019
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2019
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2019
|
Re-referred to Coms. on B. & P. and AGRI. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1210.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1092.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2019
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 523.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
Set for hearing April 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 424.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2019
|
Set for hearing March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and AGRI.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|