|
10/07/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 545, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2907.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2019
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2019
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2019
|
June 10 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 921.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2019
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2019
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 653.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2019
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|