California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB187 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 30, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2019

Amended

Bill April 22, 2019
Bill March 18, 2019